Thomas Spencer | Co-opted Governor | Governing Body | Chair of the Full Governing Board, Strategic Lead, Resources Committee, Premises Committee, Health & Safety | Yes | 18.09.17 | 27.09.25 |
Vicky Ladizhinskaya | Co-opted Governor | Governing Body | Chair of the Resources Committee, Numeracy | Yes | 16.05.23 | 15.05.27 |
Lisa Rawashdeh | Staff Governor, Head Teacher | Head Teacher - virtue of position | Head Teacher, Resources Committee, Curriculum and Community Committee | Yes | 07.01.19 | N/A |
Angela Cozier | Staff Governor | Elected by staff body | Early years practitioner, Music Lead | Yes | 11.11.18 | 09.10.26 |
Catherine Nicholls | Co-opted Governor | Governing Body | Curriculum Committee, BAME | Yes | 14.11.16 | 27.09.25 |
Camilla Borwick-Fox | Parent Governor | Elected by parent body | Parent | Yes | 15.11.2022 | 14. 11. 2026 |
Hodan Ali | Parent Governor | Elected by parent body | Parent | Yes | 04.11.2022 | 03. 11. 2026 |
Androulla Theodosiou | Voluntary Contributor | Volunteer Attendee upon invite | Deputy Head Teacher, T&L Lead, Reception Teacher | Yes | | |
Sam Hall | School Business Manager | Volunteer Attendee upon invite | Staff Admin Adviser | Yes | | |